|
10/08/2015
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 613, Statutes of 2015.
|
|
|
|
10/08/2015
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/14/2015
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4 p.m.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/02/2015
|
In Assembly. Ordered to Engrossing and Enrolling.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/02/2015
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 40. Noes 0. Page 2395.).
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/31/2015
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/27/2015
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (August 27).
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/06/2015
|
In committee: Referred to APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/24/2015
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (June 24). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/11/2015
|
Referred to Com. on ED.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/02/2015
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/02/2015
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 79. Noes 0. Page 1766.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/28/2015
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (May 28). Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/15/2015
|
In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to suspense file.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/09/2015
|
Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/08/2015
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/23/2015
|
Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/19/2015
|
From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 11. Noes 0.) (March 17).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
01/16/2015
|
Referred to Com. on HIGHER ED.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
12/02/2014
|
From printer. May be heard in committee January 1.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
12/01/2014
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|