California 2015-2016 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB25 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill December 1, 2014

Enrolled

Bill September 4, 2015

Chaptered

Bill October 8, 2015

Amended

Bill April 8, 2015
Bill March 23, 2015