|
07/06/2015
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 50, Statutes of 2015.
|
|
|
|
07/06/2015
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/26/2015
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 11 a.m.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/22/2015
|
Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 78. Noes 0. Page 2084.).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/18/2015
|
In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after June 20 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/18/2015
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 37. Noes 0. Page 1492.).
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/16/2015
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered to consent calendar.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/15/2015
|
From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (June 15).
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/28/2015
|
Referred to Com. on B., P. & E.D.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/14/2015
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/14/2015
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 78. Noes 0. Page 1453.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/12/2015
|
Read second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/11/2015
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/07/2015
|
From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (May 5).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/21/2015
|
In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/07/2015
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on HEALTH. (Ayes 14. Noes 0.) (April 7). Re-referred to Com. on HEALTH.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/06/2015
|
Re-referred to Com. on B. & P.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/26/2015
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on B. & P. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/17/2015
|
Referred to Coms. on B. & P. and HEALTH.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/10/2015
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 12.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/09/2015
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|