California 2015-2016 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB250 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 9, 2015

Enrolled

Bill June 23, 2015

Chaptered

Bill July 6, 2015

Amended

Bill June 16, 2015
Bill May 11, 2015
Bill March 26, 2015