Assembly | 11/30/2016 | From committee without further action. | ||
Assembly | 06/06/2016 | Re-referred to Com. on L. GOV. | ||
Assembly | 06/02/2016 | Assembly Rule 69 suspended. (Page 5235.) Read third time and amended. Ordered to third reading. (Page 5235.) Re-referred to Com. on L. GOV. pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.2. | ||
Assembly | 05/27/2016 | Read third time and amended. Ordered to third reading. (Page 4944.) | ||
Assembly | 04/28/2016 | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. | ||
Assembly | 04/27/2016 | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 5. Noes 2.) (April 27). | ||
Assembly | 04/19/2016 | Re-referred to Com. on H. & C.D. | ||
Assembly | 04/18/2016 | Read second time and amended. | ||
Assembly | 04/14/2016 | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on H. & C.D. (Ayes 5. Noes 3.) (April 13). | ||
Assembly | 03/30/2016 | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on L. GOV. Read second time and amended. | ||
Assembly | 03/08/2016 | Referred to Coms. on L. GOV. and H. & C.D. | ||
Assembly | 02/22/2016 | Read first time. | ||
Assembly | 02/21/2016 | From printer. May be heard in committee March 22. | ||
Assembly | 02/19/2016 | Introduced. To print. |