California 2015-2016 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB2502 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 19, 2016

Amended

Bill June 2, 2016
Bill May 27, 2016
Bill April 18, 2016
Bill March 30, 2016