California 2015-2016 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB2506 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 19, 2016

Enrolled

Bill September 2, 2016

Chaptered

Bill September 16, 2016

Amended

Bill August 19, 2016
Bill August 16, 2016
Bill June 29, 2016
Bill May 27, 2016
Bill March 30, 2016