LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
California CA
Legislatures
2015-2016 Regular Session
Assembly
Bills
AB2506
Compare Versions
CA
California Assembly Bill AB2506
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
California 2015-2016 Regular Session
California Assembly Bill AB2506
Compare Versions
AB2506 Chaptered September 16, 2016
AB2506 Enrolled September 2, 2016
AB2506 Amended August 19, 2016
AB2506 Amended August 16, 2016
AB2506 Amended June 29, 2016
AB2506 Amended May 27, 2016
AB2506 Amended March 30, 2016
AB2506 Introduced February 19, 2016
Version 1 (Old)
AB2506 Chaptered September 16, 2016
AB2506 Enrolled September 2, 2016
AB2506 Amended August 19, 2016
AB2506 Amended August 16, 2016
AB2506 Amended June 29, 2016
AB2506 Amended May 27, 2016
AB2506 Amended March 30, 2016
AB2506 Introduced February 19, 2016
Version 2 (New)
Compare