|
09/21/2016
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 420, Statutes of 2016.
|
|
|
|
09/21/2016
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/31/2016
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4 p.m.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/23/2016
|
Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 68. Noes 11. Page 6105.).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/16/2016
|
In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after August 18 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/15/2016
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 36. Noes 0. Page 4953.).
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/27/2016
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/23/2016
|
From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 10. Noes 1.) (June 21).
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/15/2016
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on T. & H.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/19/2016
|
Referred to Com. on T. & H.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/09/2016
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/09/2016
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 64. Noes 9. Page 4723.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/04/2016
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/03/2016
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (May 3).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/26/2016
|
Re-referred to Com. on JUD.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/25/2016
|
Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/21/2016
|
From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on JUD. (Ayes 6. Noes 1.) (April 20).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/10/2016
|
Referred to Coms. on H. & C.D. and JUD.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/22/2016
|
Read first time.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/21/2016
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 22.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/19/2016
|
Introduced. To print.
|
|
|