California 2015-2016 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB2584 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 19, 2016

Enrolled

Bill August 25, 2016

Chaptered

Bill September 21, 2016

Amended

Bill June 27, 2016
Bill June 15, 2016
Bill April 25, 2016