|
09/28/2016
|
Vetoed by Governor.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/09/2016
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 2:30 p.m.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/30/2016
|
In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. Assembly Rule 63 suspended. (Page 6474.) Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 67. Noes 7. Page 6488.).
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/25/2016
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 23. Noes 11. Page 5417.).
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/22/2016
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/19/2016
|
Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/01/2016
|
Withdrawn from committee. Ordered to second reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/30/2016
|
Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/29/2016
|
From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 9. Noes 1.) (June 28).
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/09/2016
|
Referred to Com. on T. & H.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/06/2016
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/02/2016
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 66. Noes 11. Page 5198.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/31/2016
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/27/2016
|
From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 19. Noes 1.) (May 27).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/11/2016
|
In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/21/2016
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 6. Noes 3.) (April 20). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/07/2016
|
Re-referred to Com. on L. GOV.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/06/2016
|
Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/05/2016
|
From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on L. GOV. (Ayes 16. Noes 0.) (April 4).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/10/2016
|
Referred to Coms. on TRANS. and L. GOV.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/22/2016
|
Read first time.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/21/2016
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 22.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/19/2016
|
Introduced. To print.
|
|
|