California 2015-2016 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB2586 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 19, 2016

Enrolled

Bill September 1, 2016

Amended

Bill August 19, 2016
Bill June 30, 2016
Bill May 31, 2016
Bill April 6, 2016