|
09/25/2016
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 617, Statutes of 2016.
|
|
|
|
09/25/2016
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/07/2016
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3 p.m.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/29/2016
|
Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 79. Noes 0. Page 6397.).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/24/2016
|
In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after August 26 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/18/2016
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 36. Noes 0. Page 5130.).
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/02/2016
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/01/2016
|
From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (June 28).
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/23/2016
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on JUD. (Ayes 8. Noes 0.) (June 22). Re-referred to Com. on JUD.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/13/2016
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on INS.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/09/2016
|
Referred to Coms. on INS. and JUD.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/01/2016
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/31/2016
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 80. Noes 0. Page 5011.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/27/2016
|
Read third time and amended. Ordered to third reading. (Page 4948.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/11/2016
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/10/2016
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/09/2016
|
From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 10. Noes 0.) (May 3).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/21/2016
|
Re-referred to Com. on JUD. pursuant to Assembly Rule 97.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/12/2016
|
From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 13. Noes 0.) (April 6).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/04/2016
|
Re-referred to Com. on INS.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/31/2016
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on INS. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/17/2016
|
Referred to Com. on INS. From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on INS. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/22/2016
|
Read first time.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/21/2016
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 22.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/19/2016
|
Introduced. To print.
|
|
|