California 2015-2016 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB2591 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 19, 2016

Enrolled

Bill August 30, 2016

Chaptered

Bill September 25, 2016

Amended

Bill August 2, 2016
Bill June 13, 2016
Bill May 27, 2016
Bill May 10, 2016
Bill April 13, 2016
Bill March 31, 2016
Bill March 17, 2016