Senate
|
11/30/2016
|
From Senate committee without further action.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/17/2016
|
Re-referred to Com. on RLS.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/15/2016
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/11/2016
|
From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 5. Noes 2.) (August 11).
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/08/2016
|
Referred to APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/01/2016
|
Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/30/2016
|
From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 1.) (June 27).
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/23/2016
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on B., P. & E.D.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/13/2016
|
In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/04/2016
|
Referred to Com. on B., P. & E.D.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/27/2016
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
01/27/2016
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 63. Noes 1. Page 3506.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
01/26/2016
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
01/25/2016
|
From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 13. Noes 0.) (January 21). Read second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
01/21/2016
|
In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
01/14/2016
|
Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
01/13/2016
|
Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
01/12/2016
|
From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 13. Noes 0.) (January 12).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
01/05/2016
|
From committee: Be re-referred to Com. on B. & P. Re-referred. (Ayes 7. Noes 4.) (January 5). Re-referred to Com. on B. & P.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
01/04/2016
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on B. & P. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on B. & P. Re-referred to Com. on RLS. pursuant to Assembly Rule 96.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/09/2015
|
Referred to Coms. on B. & P. and HEALTH.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
12/02/2014
|
From printer. May be heard in committee January 1.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
12/01/2014
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|