California 2015-2016 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB26 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill December 1, 2014

Amended

Bill August 15, 2016
Bill August 1, 2016
Bill June 23, 2016
Bill June 20, 2016
Bill January 25, 2016
Bill January 13, 2016
Bill January 4, 2016