|
09/23/2016
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 527, Statutes of 2016.
|
|
|
|
09/23/2016
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/02/2016
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 12 p.m.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/24/2016
|
Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 80. Noes 0. Page 6212.).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/19/2016
|
In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after August 21 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/19/2016
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 36. Noes 0. Page 5163.).
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/16/2016
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/15/2016
|
From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (August 11).
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/08/2016
|
Referred to APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/02/2016
|
Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/01/2016
|
From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (June 28).
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/09/2016
|
Referred to Com. on JUD.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/01/2016
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/31/2016
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 80. Noes 0. Page 5041.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/27/2016
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 20. Noes 0.) (May 27). Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/04/2016
|
In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/20/2016
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 11. Noes 0.) (April 19). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/13/2016
|
Re-referred to Com. on P. & C.P.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/12/2016
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on P. & C.P. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/30/2016
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on P. & C.P. (Ayes 19. Noes 0.) (March 29). Re-referred to Com. on P. & C.P.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/17/2016
|
Re-referred to Com. on HEALTH.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/16/2016
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on HEALTH. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/10/2016
|
Referred to Coms. on HEALTH and P. & C.P.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/22/2016
|
Read first time.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/21/2016
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 22.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/19/2016
|
Introduced. To print.
|
|
|