LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
California CA
Legislatures
2015-2016 Regular Session
Assembly
Bills
AB2636
Compare Versions
CA
California Assembly Bill AB2636
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
California 2015-2016 Regular Session
California Assembly Bill AB2636
Compare Versions
AB2636 Chaptered September 23, 2016
AB2636 Enrolled August 25, 2016
AB2636 Amended August 16, 2016
AB2636 Amended August 2, 2016
AB2636 Amended April 12, 2016
AB2636 Amended March 16, 2016
AB2636 Introduced February 19, 2016
Version 1 (Old)
AB2636 Chaptered September 23, 2016
AB2636 Enrolled August 25, 2016
AB2636 Amended August 16, 2016
AB2636 Amended August 2, 2016
AB2636 Amended April 12, 2016
AB2636 Amended March 16, 2016
AB2636 Introduced February 19, 2016
Version 2 (New)
Compare