California 2015-2016 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB2651 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 19, 2016

Enrolled

Bill August 31, 2016

Chaptered

Bill September 22, 2016

Amended

Bill August 19, 2016
Bill May 25, 2016
Bill April 20, 2016
Bill March 29, 2016