LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
California CA
Legislatures
2015-2016 Regular Session
Assembly
Bills
AB2651
Compare Versions
CA
California Assembly Bill AB2651
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
California 2015-2016 Regular Session
California Assembly Bill AB2651
Compare Versions
AB2651 Chaptered September 22, 2016
AB2651 Enrolled August 31, 2016
AB2651 Amended August 19, 2016
AB2651 Amended May 25, 2016
AB2651 Amended April 20, 2016
AB2651 Amended March 29, 2016
AB2651 Introduced February 19, 2016
Version 1 (Old)
AB2651 Chaptered September 22, 2016
AB2651 Enrolled August 31, 2016
AB2651 Amended August 19, 2016
AB2651 Amended May 25, 2016
AB2651 Amended April 20, 2016
AB2651 Amended March 29, 2016
AB2651 Introduced February 19, 2016
Version 2 (New)
Compare