Senate
|
11/30/2016
|
Died on Senate third reading file.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/30/2016
|
Withdrawn from committee. (Ayes 24. Noes 13. Page 5529.) Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/23/2016
|
Withdrawn from committee. Re-referred to Com. on RLS.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/22/2016
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading. Re-referred to Com. on RLS. pursuant to Senate Rule 29.10(b). From committee: Be re-referred to Com. on JUD. pursuant to Senate Rule 29.10(b). (Ayes 5. Noes 0.) Re-referred to Com. on JUD.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/19/2016
|
Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/30/2016
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/29/2016
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 5. Noes 2.) (June 28).
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/19/2016
|
Referred to Com. on JUD.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/12/2016
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/12/2016
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 54. Noes 14. Page 4773.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/04/2016
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 8. Noes 0.) (May 3).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/02/2016
|
Re-referred to Com. on P. & C.P.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/28/2016
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on P. & C.P. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/18/2016
|
In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/31/2016
|
In committee: Hearing postponed by committee.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/10/2016
|
Referred to Com. on P. & C.P.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/22/2016
|
Read first time.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/21/2016
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 22.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/19/2016
|
Introduced. To print.
|
|
|