California 2015-2016 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB2688 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 19, 2016

Amended

Bill August 19, 2016
Bill April 28, 2016
Bill April 11, 2016
Bill March 28, 2016