|
09/23/2016
|
Vetoed by Governor.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/29/2016
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4 p.m.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/22/2016
|
Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 78. Noes 0. Page 6037.).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/16/2016
|
In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after August 18 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/15/2016
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 37. Noes 0. Page 4968.).
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/02/2016
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/01/2016
|
Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/15/2016
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/14/2016
|
From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 6. Noes 1.) (June 8).
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/12/2016
|
Referred to Com. on GOV. & F.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/02/2016
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/02/2016
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 75. Noes 0. Page 4623.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/26/2016
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (April 25).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/20/2016
|
Re-referred to Com. on REV. & TAX.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/19/2016
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on REV. & TAX. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/11/2016
|
In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/17/2016
|
Referred to Com. on REV. & TAX.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/22/2016
|
Read first time.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/21/2016
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 22.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/19/2016
|
Introduced. To print.
|
|
|