California 2015-2016 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB2691 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 19, 2016

Enrolled

Bill August 23, 2016

Amended

Bill August 1, 2016
Bill June 21, 2016
Bill June 15, 2016
Bill April 19, 2016
Bill March 18, 2016