|
09/25/2016
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 618, Statutes of 2016.
|
|
|
|
09/25/2016
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/09/2016
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 2:30 p.m.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/30/2016
|
Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 80. Noes 0. Page 6457.).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/26/2016
|
In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after August 28 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/24/2016
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 5346.).
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/22/2016
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/19/2016
|
Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/02/2016
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/01/2016
|
From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (June 28).
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/22/2016
|
Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on JUD.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/21/2016
|
From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on JUD. (Ayes 6. Noes 0.) (June 15).
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/06/2016
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on GOV. & F.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/02/2016
|
Referred to Coms. on GOV. & F. and JUD.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/23/2016
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/23/2016
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 75. Noes 0. Page 4894.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/10/2016
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/09/2016
|
From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (May 4).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/02/2016
|
Measure version as amended on April 28 corrected. Re-referred to Com. on L. GOV.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/28/2016
|
Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/27/2016
|
From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on L. GOV. (Ayes 11. Noes 1.) (April 25).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/21/2016
|
Assembly Rule 56 suspended. (Page 4448.) (pending re-refer to Com. on L. GOV.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/13/2016
|
In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/12/2016
|
Re-referred to Com. on B. & F.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/11/2016
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on B. & F. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/17/2016
|
Referred to Com. on B. & F. From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on B. & F. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/22/2016
|
Read first time.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/21/2016
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 22.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/19/2016
|
Introduced. To print.
|
|
|