California 2015-2016 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB2693 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 19, 2016

Enrolled

Bill September 1, 2016

Chaptered

Bill September 25, 2016

Amended

Bill August 19, 2016
Bill August 2, 2016
Bill June 22, 2016
Bill June 6, 2016
Bill May 10, 2016
Bill April 28, 2016
Bill April 11, 2016
Bill March 17, 2016