|
09/27/2016
|
Vetoed by Governor.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/29/2016
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4 p.m.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/22/2016
|
Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 77. Noes 0. Page 6037.).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/16/2016
|
In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after August 18 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/15/2016
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 38. Noes 0. Page 4971.).
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/08/2016
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/04/2016
|
Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/27/2016
|
From committee: Be placed on second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/15/2016
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 6. Noes 0.) (June 14). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/26/2016
|
Referred to Com. on JUD.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/19/2016
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/19/2016
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 76. Noes 0. Page 4871.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/12/2016
|
Read second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/11/2016
|
From committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 20. Noes 0.) (May 11).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/27/2016
|
Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/26/2016
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/20/2016
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 11. Noes 0.) (April 19). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/12/2016
|
Re-referred to Com. on P. & C.P.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/11/2016
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on P. & C.P. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/05/2016
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on P. & C.P. (Ayes 10. Noes 0.) (April 5). Re-referred to Com. on P. & C.P.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/10/2016
|
Referred to Coms. on JUD. and P. & C.P.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/22/2016
|
Read first time.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/21/2016
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 22.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/19/2016
|
Introduced. To print.
|
|
|