California 2015-2016 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB2707 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 19, 2016

Enrolled

Bill August 23, 2016

Amended

Bill August 4, 2016
Bill April 26, 2016
Bill April 11, 2016