California 2015-2016 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB271 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 10, 2015

Enrolled

Bill September 3, 2015

Chaptered

Bill October 4, 2015

Amended

Bill May 28, 2015
Bill April 7, 2015