LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
California CA
Legislatures
2015-2016 Regular Session
Assembly
Bills
AB271
Compare Versions
CA
California Assembly Bill AB271
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
California 2015-2016 Regular Session
California Assembly Bill AB271
Compare Versions
AB271 Chaptered October 4, 2015
AB271 Enrolled September 3, 2015
AB271 Amended May 28, 2015
AB271 Amended April 7, 2015
AB271 Introduced February 10, 2015
Version 1 (Old)
AB271 Chaptered October 4, 2015
AB271 Enrolled September 3, 2015
AB271 Amended May 28, 2015
AB271 Amended April 7, 2015
AB271 Introduced February 10, 2015
Version 2 (New)
Compare