California 2015-2016 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB2715 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 19, 2016

Amended

Bill June 20, 2016
Bill May 27, 2016
Bill May 11, 2016
Bill April 20, 2016
Bill April 7, 2016