California 2015-2016 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB2715 Latest Draft

Bill / Amended Version Filed 06/20/2016

 BILL NUMBER: AB 2715AMENDED BILL TEXT AMENDED IN SENATE JUNE 20, 2016 AMENDED IN ASSEMBLY MAY 27, 2016 AMENDED IN ASSEMBLY MAY 11, 2016 AMENDED IN ASSEMBLY APRIL 20, 2016 AMENDED IN ASSEMBLY APRIL 7, 2016 INTRODUCED BY Assembly Members Eduardo Garcia, Alejo, and Dodd (Coauthors: Assembly Members Roger Hernndez and Salas) (Coauthor: Senator Nielsen) FEBRUARY 19, 2016 An act to add Section 12087.6 to the Government Code, relating to energy efficiency. LEGISLATIVE COUNSEL'S DIGEST AB 2715, as amended, Eduardo Garcia. Agricultural Working Poor Energy Efficient Housing Program. Existing law establishes the Department of Community Services and Development and requires the department to administer, among other things, the federal Low-Income Home Energy Assistance Program. Existing law requires the department to develop and administer the Energy Efficiency Low-Income Weatherization Program and to expend moneys appropriated by the Legislature for the purposes of the program. This bill would require the department to develop and administer the Agricultural Working Poor Energy Efficient Housing Program and to expend moneys appropriated by the Legislature for the purposes of the program to improve energy efficiency in farmworker-owned housing.  The bill would require the department to report to the Legislature on the program with respect to   balances and expenditures, households reached, demographics of the households reached, measures funded, and energy savings.  Existing law requires the Public Utilities Commission (PUC) to supervise certain low-income targeted energy efficiency programs administered by electrical corporations, gas corporations, or 3rd-party administrators, and requires the State Energy Resources Conservation and Development Commission (Energy Commission) to undertake various activities and administer various programs to promote energy efficiency. This bill would require the department, in developing the Agricultural Working Poor Energy Efficient Housing Program, to consult with the PUC and the Energy Commission in order to  ensure compatibility with the state's energy policies and goals and to  avoid duplication  with   of  the energy efficiency programs supervised by those commissions. Vote: majority. Appropriation: no. Fiscal committee: yes. State-mandated local program: no. THE PEOPLE OF THE STATE OF CALIFORNIA DO ENACT AS FOLLOWS: SECTION 1. Section 12087.6 is added to the Government Code, to read: 12087.6. (a) The department shall develop and administer the Agricultural Working Poor Energy Efficient Housing Program and expend moneys appropriated by the Legislature for the purposes of the program. (b) (1) Moneys appropriated for the program shall be used to improve energy efficiency in  farmworker-owned   farmworker  housing,  including   including, but not limited to,  for all of the following: (A) Weatherization of homes and other residences. (B) Replacement of energy inefficient appliances with Energy Star-certified appliances. (C) Replacement of lighting with light-emitting diode, commonly known as LED, lighting. (D) Installation of photovoltaic solar panels and solar water heating systems. (E) Installation of battery backups. (2) When distributing moneys appropriated for the program, the department shall give preference to an association of federally designated farmworker organizations and other organizations that have a proven track record of assisting farmworkers. (c) (1) The department  may develop requirements, guidelines, and   shall develop program requirements and guidelines, including income-based program eligibility limits, and may develop  subgrantee contract provisions for the program. (2) The department shall do all of the following: (A) Consult with the Public Utilities Commission and the State Energy Resources Conservation and Development Commission in developing the program in order to  ensure compatibility with the state's energy policies and goals and to  avoid duplication  with   of  the energy efficiency programs supervised by those commissions. (B) Not less than 30 days before finalization of the program guidelines, post the draft program guidelines on the department's Internet Web site. (C) Hold a public hearing to obtain public input on the draft program guidelines with notice of the hearing published prominently on the department's Internet Web site no less than 15 days before the hearing.  (D) By January 1 of the third calendar year following receipt of funding for the program, report to the budget committees and appropriate policy committees of each house of the Legislature on program balances and expenditures, the number of households reached by the program, the demographics of households reached, including whether the household is owner occupied or occupant rented, a list of measures funded by the program, and an estimate of the energy saved by the program.