|
09/09/2016
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 272, Statutes of 2016.
|
|
|
|
09/09/2016
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/02/2016
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 12 p.m.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/24/2016
|
Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 60. Noes 17. Page 6200.).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/19/2016
|
In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after August 21 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/18/2016
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 30. Noes 6. Page 5114.).
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/15/2016
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/11/2016
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 6. Noes 1.) (August 11).
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/08/2016
|
Referred to APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/01/2016
|
Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/30/2016
|
From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 6. Noes 2.) (June 28).
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/20/2016
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on N.R. & W.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/09/2016
|
Referred to Com. on N.R. & W.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/06/2016
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/02/2016
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading. Assembly Rule 63 suspended. (Page 5166.) Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 62. Noes 14. Page 5173.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/01/2016
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/31/2016
|
From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 12. Noes 6.) (May 27).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/18/2016
|
In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/12/2016
|
Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/11/2016
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/14/2016
|
Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/13/2016
|
From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 4. Noes 3.) (April 12).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/11/2016
|
Re-referred to Com. on E.S. & T.M.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/06/2016
|
From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on E.S. & T.M. (Ayes 6. Noes 2.) (April 4).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/10/2016
|
Referred to Coms. on NAT. RES. and E.S. & T.M.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/22/2016
|
Read first time.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/21/2016
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 22.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/19/2016
|
Introduced. To print.
|
|
|