California 2015-2016 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB2729 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 19, 2016

Enrolled

Bill August 25, 2016

Chaptered

Bill September 9, 2016

Amended

Bill August 1, 2016
Bill June 20, 2016
Bill June 1, 2016
Bill May 11, 2016
Bill April 14, 2016
Bill April 7, 2016