|
09/25/2016
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 619, Statutes of 2016.
|
|
|
|
09/25/2016
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/02/2016
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 12 p.m.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/24/2016
|
Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 79. Noes 0. Page 6203.).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/19/2016
|
In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after August 21 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/18/2016
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 37. Noes 0. Page 5129.).
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/16/2016
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/15/2016
|
From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 4. Noes 0.) (June 14).
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/12/2016
|
Referred to Com. on HUMAN S.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/05/2016
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/05/2016
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 79. Noes 0. Page 4683.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/28/2016
|
Read second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/27/2016
|
From committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 6. Noes 0.) (April 26).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/13/2016
|
Re-referred to Com. on HUM. S.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/12/2016
|
In committee: Hearing postponed by committee. From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on HUM. S. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/18/2016
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on HUM. S. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/17/2016
|
Referred to Com. on HUM. S.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/22/2016
|
Read first time.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/21/2016
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 22.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/19/2016
|
Introduced. To print.
|
|
|