California 2015-2016 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB2767 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 19, 2016

Enrolled

Bill August 25, 2016

Chaptered

Bill September 25, 2016

Amended

Bill June 16, 2016
Bill April 12, 2016
Bill March 18, 2016