|
09/27/2016
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 699, Statutes of 2016.
|
|
|
|
09/27/2016
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/12/2016
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 11:30 a.m.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/31/2016
|
From committee: That the Senate amendments be concurred in. (Ayes 11. Noes 6.) (August 30). Assembly Rule 63 suspended. (Page 6544.) Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 50. Noes 28. Page 6551.).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/18/2016
|
Re-referred to Com. on G.O. pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.2.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/17/2016
|
In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after August 19 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/17/2016
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 27. Noes 11. Page 5048.).
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/15/2016
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/11/2016
|
From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 5. Noes 2.) (August 11).
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/01/2016
|
In committee: Referred to APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/28/2016
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 8. Noes 0.) (June 27). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/16/2016
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on B., P. & E.D.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/09/2016
|
Referred to Com. on B., P. & E.D.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/27/2016
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/27/2016
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 44. Noes 26. Page 4955.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/19/2016
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/18/2016
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 14. Noes 6.) (May 18).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/16/2016
|
Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/12/2016
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/21/2016
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 12. Noes 8.) (April 20). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/10/2016
|
Referred to Com. on G.O.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/22/2016
|
Read first time.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/21/2016
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 22.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/19/2016
|
Introduced. To print.
|
|
|