California 2015-2016 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB2770 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 19, 2016

Enrolled

Bill September 2, 2016

Chaptered

Bill September 27, 2016

Amended

Bill August 15, 2016
Bill June 16, 2016
Bill May 12, 2016