BILL NUMBER: AB 2790AMENDED BILL TEXT AMENDED IN SENATE JUNE 27, 2016 AMENDED IN SENATE JUNE 21, 2016 AMENDED IN ASSEMBLY APRIL 13, 2016 AMENDED IN ASSEMBLY MARCH 18, 2016 INTRODUCED BY Assembly Member Nazarian FEBRUARY 19, 2016 An act to amend Section 6311 of the Government Code, relating to the international genocidememorial.memorial, and declaring the urgency thereof, to take effect immediately. LEGISLATIVE COUNSEL'S DIGEST AB 2790, as amended, Nazarian. State Capitol Historic Region: international genocide memorial. Existing law authorizes the construction of an international genocide memorial in the Capitol Historic Region and provides for the establishment of a commission in that regard. Existing law prohibits construction of the memorial until the master plan of the State Capitol Park is approved and adopted by the Joint Committee on Rules. This bill would, in addition, authorizeconstructionthe department to apply to the Joint Committee on Rules for an exemption to allow siting and construction of the memorialto beginif the master plan of the State Capitol Park is not approved or adoptedby the Joint Committee on Ruleson or beforeDecember 31, 2020.January 1, 2021. This bill would declare that it is to take effect immediately as an urgency statute. Vote:majority2/3 . Appropriation: no. Fiscal committee: yes. State-mandated local program: no. THE PEOPLE OF THE STATE OF CALIFORNIA DO ENACT AS FOLLOWS: SECTION 1. Section 6311 of the Government Code is amended to read: 6311. (a) The construction of a memorial to California's genocide survivors in the Capitol Historic Region is hereby authorized. The actual construction of the memorial may not proceed without the prior approval of the Department of General Services and the Capitol Park Master Plan Group. (b) The department shall not begin construction of the memorial until the master plan of the State Capitol Park is approved and adopted by the Joint Committee on Rules. However, if the master plan of the State Capitol Park is not approved or adopted by the Joint Committee on Rules on or beforeDecember 31, 2020,January 1, 2021, the department maybegin construction of the memorial.apply to the Joint Committee on Rules for an exemption to allow siting and construction. (c) Funds for the construction of the memorial shall be provided through private contributions. The commission may receive contributions for this purpose. (d) The department, in consultation with the International Genocide Memorial Commission, shall seek to accomplish the following goals: (1) Review the preliminary design plans to identify potential maintenance concerns. (2) Compliance with the Americans with Disabilities Act and other safety concerns. (3) Review and approval of proper California Environmental Quality Act documents prepared for work at the designated historic property. (4) Review of final construction documents to ensure that all requirements are met. (5) Preparation of the right of entry permit outlining the final area of work, final construction documents, construction plans, the contractor hired to perform the work, insurance, bonding, provisions for damage to state property, and inspection requirements. SEC. 2. This act is an urgency statute necessary for the immediate preservation of the public peace, health, or safety within the meaning of Article IV of the Constitution and shall go into immediate effect. The facts constituting the necessity are: In order to honor the purposes for which the memorial to California's genocide survivors will be constructed in the Capitol Historic Region in a timely manner, it is necessary that this act take effect immediately.