LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
California CA
Legislatures
2015-2016 Regular Session
Assembly
Bills
AB2790
Compare Versions
CA
California Assembly Bill AB2790
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
California 2015-2016 Regular Session
California Assembly Bill AB2790
Compare Versions
AB2790 Chaptered September 27, 2016
AB2790 Enrolled August 31, 2016
AB2790 Amended June 27, 2016
AB2790 Amended June 21, 2016
AB2790 Amended April 13, 2016
AB2790 Amended March 18, 2016
AB2790 Introduced February 19, 2016
Version 1 (Old)
AB2790 Chaptered September 27, 2016
AB2790 Enrolled August 31, 2016
AB2790 Amended June 27, 2016
AB2790 Amended June 21, 2016
AB2790 Amended April 13, 2016
AB2790 Amended March 18, 2016
AB2790 Introduced February 19, 2016
Version 2 (New)
Compare