California 2015-2016 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB2790 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 19, 2016

Enrolled

Bill August 31, 2016

Chaptered

Bill September 27, 2016

Amended

Bill June 27, 2016
Bill June 21, 2016
Bill April 13, 2016
Bill March 18, 2016