|
08/30/2016
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 248, Statutes of 2016.
|
|
|
|
08/30/2016
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/22/2016
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4 p.m.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/16/2016
|
In Assembly. Ordered to Engrossing and Enrolling.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/15/2016
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 38. Noes 0. Page 4986.).
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/30/2016
|
From Consent Calendar. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/28/2016
|
Read second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/27/2016
|
From committee: Be placed on second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8 and ordered to consent calendar.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/15/2016
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (June 15). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/26/2016
|
Referred to Com. on GOV. & F.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/19/2016
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/19/2016
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 76. Noes 0. Page 4872.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/11/2016
|
From committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 20. Noes 0.) (May 11).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/05/2016
|
Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/04/2016
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/26/2016
|
Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/25/2016
|
From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 8. Noes 0.) (April 20).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/11/2016
|
From committee: Be re-referred to Com. on L. GOV. Re-referred. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (April 11). Re-referred to Com. on L. GOV.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/07/2016
|
Re-referred to Com. on RLS. pursuant to Assembly Rule 96.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/05/2016
|
Re-referred to Com. on JUD.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/04/2016
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on JUD. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/14/2016
|
Referred to Com. on JUD.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/22/2016
|
Read first time.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/21/2016
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 22.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/19/2016
|
Introduced. To print.
|
|
|