California 2015-2016 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB2801 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 19, 2016

Enrolled

Bill August 17, 2016

Chaptered

Bill August 30, 2016

Amended

Bill May 4, 2016
Bill April 26, 2016
Bill April 4, 2016