Assembly | 05/31/2016 | Read third time. Refused passage. (Ayes 10. Noes 50. Page 5008.). Motion to reconsider made by Assembly Member Mark Stone. | ||
Assembly | 05/27/2016 | Read third time and amended. Ordered to third reading. (Page 4944.) | ||
Assembly | 04/27/2016 | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. | ||
Assembly | 04/26/2016 | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 10. Noes 0.) (April 26). | ||
Assembly | 04/19/2016 | Re-referred to Com. on JUD. | ||
Assembly | 04/18/2016 | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on JUD. Read second time and amended. | ||
Assembly | 03/28/2016 | Referred to Com. on JUD. | ||
Assembly | 02/26/2016 | From printer. May be heard in committee March 27. | ||
Assembly | 02/25/2016 | Read first time. To print. |