California 2015-2016 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB2878 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 25, 2016

Amended

Bill August 31, 2016
Bill August 19, 2016
Bill June 2, 2016
Bill May 27, 2016
Bill April 18, 2016