|
09/09/2016
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 277, Statutes of 2016.
|
|
|
|
09/09/2016
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/24/2016
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 11:45 a.m.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/18/2016
|
Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 79. Noes 0. Page 5873.).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/11/2016
|
In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after August 14 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/11/2016
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 37. Noes 0. Page 4869.).
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/30/2016
|
Read second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/29/2016
|
From committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (June 29).
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/22/2016
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on B. & F.I.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/20/2016
|
In committee: Hearing postponed by committee.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/13/2016
|
In committee: Hearing postponed by committee. From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on B. & F.I.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/12/2016
|
Referred to Com. on B. & F.I.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/02/2016
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/02/2016
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 76. Noes 0. Page 4626.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/26/2016
|
From committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 12. Noes 0.) (April 25).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/28/2016
|
Referred to Com. on B. & F.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/09/2016
|
From printer. May be heard in committee April 8.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/08/2016
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|