California 2015-2016 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB2907 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill March 8, 2016

Enrolled

Bill August 19, 2016

Chaptered

Bill September 9, 2016

Amended

Bill June 22, 2016
Bill June 13, 2016
Bill May 23, 2016