|
10/11/2015
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 767, Statutes of 2015.
|
|
|
|
10/11/2015
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/18/2015
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4 p.m.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/10/2015
|
Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 60. Noes 10. Page 3048.).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/09/2015
|
Assembly Rule 77 suspended. (Ayes 52. Noes 28. Page 2990.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/08/2015
|
In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after September 10 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/08/2015
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 25. Noes 10. Page 2595.).
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/04/2015
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/03/2015
|
Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/01/2015
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/31/2015
|
From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 5. Noes 2.) (August 27).
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/29/2015
|
In committee: Referred to APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/17/2015
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 6. Noes 1.) (June 17). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/04/2015
|
In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/14/2015
|
Referred to Com. on ED.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/04/2015
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/04/2015
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 60. Noes 9. Page 1259.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/29/2015
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 12. Noes 3.) (April 29).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/21/2015
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 6. Noes 0.) (April 21). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/08/2015
|
Re-referred to Com. on A.,E.,S.,T., & I.M.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/07/2015
|
Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/06/2015
|
From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on A.,E.,S.,T., & I.M. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (March 25).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
01/16/2015
|
Referred to Coms. on ED. and A.,E.,S.,T., & I.M.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
12/02/2014
|
From printer. May be heard in committee January 1.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
12/01/2014
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|