California 2015-2016 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB30 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill December 1, 2014

Enrolled

Bill September 14, 2015

Chaptered

Bill October 11, 2015

Amended

Bill September 3, 2015
Bill September 1, 2015
Bill April 7, 2015