|
07/15/2015
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 104, Statutes of 2015.
|
|
|
|
07/15/2015
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
07/09/2015
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 2 p.m.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
07/02/2015
|
Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 78. Noes 0. Page 2225.).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/29/2015
|
In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after July 1 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/29/2015
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 1665.).
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/24/2015
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered to consent calendar.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/23/2015
|
From committee: Be placed on second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8, be amended, and ordered to consent calendar.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/09/2015
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (June 9). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/14/2015
|
Referred to Com. on N.R. & W.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/30/2015
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/30/2015
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 77. Noes 0. Page 1222.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/23/2015
|
Read second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/22/2015
|
From committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (April 22).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/16/2015
|
Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/15/2015
|
Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/14/2015
|
From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (April 13).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/23/2015
|
In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/23/2015
|
Referred to Com. on NAT. RES.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/13/2015
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 15.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/12/2015
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|